02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/03/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/02/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/15/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and E. & R. | |||
01/04/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. | |||
01/03/2011 | Read first time. To print. |