|
08/25/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1653.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|