06/28/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
06/20/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/13/2011 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
05/19/2011 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
05/12/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1336.) | |||
04/11/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/07/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |