|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 4929.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5866.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4435.).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 16). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1654.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|