|
07/15/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 85, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 2074.).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1535.).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 1. Page 980.)
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|