07/01/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 51, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/29/2011 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/21/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:40 a.m. | |||
06/16/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/16/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1444.). | |||
06/08/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/07/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7). | |||
05/12/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/14/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/14/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 977.) | |||
04/11/2011 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 905.) | |||
04/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |