LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB801
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB801
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB801
Compare Versions
AB801 Chaptered September 13, 2012
AB801 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB801 Amended August 20, 2012
AB801 Amended July 2, 2012
AB801 Amended January 11, 2012
AB801 Amended January 4, 2012
AB801 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB801 Chaptered September 13, 2012
AB801 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB801 Amended August 20, 2012
AB801 Amended July 2, 2012
AB801 Amended January 11, 2012
AB801 Amended January 4, 2012
AB801 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare