|
07/25/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 108, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2185.).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1688.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 906.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|