|
08/30/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1569.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|