|
09/29/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 357, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2542.).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1865.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1566.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|