BILL NUMBER: AB 817AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 12, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gatto FEBRUARY 17, 2011An act to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 1936) to Title 5 of Part 4 of Division 3 of, and to repeal Sections 1936, 1936.01, 1936.015, 1936.05, and 1936.1 of, the Civil Code,An act relating to vehicle rental contracts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 817, as amended, Gatto. Vehicle rental contracts. Existing law governs contracts between rental car companies and their customers. Those provisions, among other things, require a rental company to disclose specified information to a potential renter, set forth a renter's responsibilities and liabilities, and impose certain requirements on advertising. This bill wouldrevise and recast those provisions to, among other things, recodify and reorganize the provisions, revise the definitions of certain terms, including the definitions for "additional charges" and "membership program" and make the definitions used in those provisions consistent throughout those provisions. The bill would state that its provisions are declaratory of existing lawrequire the California Law Revision Commission to study whether the laws regulating vehicle rental companies and their c onsu mers would benefit from greater clarity and concision, and to report its findings and recommendations to the Legislature on or before December 31, 2012 . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:noyes . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The California Law Revision Commission shall study whether the laws regulating vehicle rental companies and their consumers, including, but not limited to, Sections 1936, 1936.01, 1936.015, 1936.05, and 1936.1 of the Civil Code, would benefit from greater clarity and concision, and shall report its findings and recommendations to the Legislature on or before December 31, 2012. All matter omitted in this version of the bill appears in the bill as amended in the Assembly, April 17, 2011. (JR11)