California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB819 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 14, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill May 8, 2012
Bill January 11, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill March 31, 2011