|
09/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 207, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 1959.).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 16. Page 1784.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wolk. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1784.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 1238.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|