LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB822
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB822
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB822
Action History
02/01/2012
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
01/11/2012
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
03/29/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/10/2011
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
02/18/2011
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
02/17/2011
Read first time. To print.