California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB823 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Amended

Bill June 13, 2012
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill July 12, 2011
Bill June 27, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill April 28, 2011
Bill April 12, 2011