06/13/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
08/25/2011 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
06/27/2011 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/15/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
05/23/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/23/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 1497.) | |||
05/09/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 4). | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |