LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB829
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB829
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB829
Action History
01/10/2012
In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
01/04/2012
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
04/26/2011
In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
04/12/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/10/2011
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
02/18/2011
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
02/17/2011
Read first time. To print.