LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB83
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB83
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB83
Action History
02/01/2012
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
04/11/2011
In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
04/04/2011
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
03/21/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
01/27/2011
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
01/06/2011
From printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
01/05/2011
Read first time. To print.