02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/17/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3513.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |||
01/05/2012 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/04/2012 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |||
06/02/2011 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Ammiano. | |||
05/26/2011 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1553.) | |||
05/11/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/10/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 9). | |||
04/04/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |