02/01/2012 | Died on inactive file. | |||
06/03/2011 | Reconsideration granted. (Page 1853.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Roger Hernández. | |||
05/17/2011 | June 2-Motion to reconsider continued. | |||
05/16/2011 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 26. Page 1395.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Roger Hernández. | |||
05/02/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/28/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27). | |||
04/25/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
04/14/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |