|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 224, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2441.).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1853.).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1241.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 29).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|