LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB837
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB837
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB837
Compare Versions
AB837 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB837 Enrolled August 29, 2012
AB837 Amended June 7, 2012
AB837 Amended June 20, 2011
AB837 Amended May 11, 2011
AB837 Amended March 31, 2011
AB837 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB837 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB837 Enrolled August 29, 2012
AB837 Amended June 7, 2012
AB837 Amended June 20, 2011
AB837 Amended May 11, 2011
AB837 Amended March 31, 2011
AB837 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare