|
08/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 1851.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 907.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|