|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 619, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2712.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 2012.).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 1340.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|