|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 526, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 17. Page 6467.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4745.).
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 17. Page 4652.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Emmerson. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4653.)
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Liu.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1778.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|