California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB85 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/07/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 85AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Mendoza  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Ammiano,   Hall,   and Solorio   )  JANUARY 6, 2011 An act  to amend, repeal, and add Section 17075.50 to, and  to add  Section   Sections 17075.52 and  81131 to, the Education Code, relating to school facilities. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 85, as amended, Mendoza. School facilities: security locks. Existing law, the Leroy F. Greene School Facilities Act of 1998 (the Greene Act), requires the State Allocation Board to allocate to applicant school districts prescribed per-unhoused-pupil state funding for construction and modernization of school facilities, including hardship funding and supplemental funding for site development and acquisition. Under existing law, all new construction projects submitted to the Division of the State Architect pursuant to the Greene Act are required to include locks that allow doors to classrooms and rooms with an occupancy of 5 or more persons to be locked from the inside, except as specified. Existing law requires the Department of General Services to pass upon, and approve or reject, all plans for the construction of, or, if the estimated cost exceeds $25,000, the alteration of, any building used, or designed to be used, for community college purposes. This bill, on and after July 1, 2012, would require  both new construction and  modernization projects for school facilities submitted  under the Greene Act  to the Division of the State Architect  that include rehabilitation in a classroom or a room with an occupancy of 5 or more persons  , as well as construction plans for community college facilities submitted to the Department of General Services, to include locks that allow doors to be locked from the inside, except as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 17075.50 of the Education Code is amended to read: 17075.50. (a) On and after July 1, 2011, all new construction projects submitted to the Division of the State Architect pursuant to this chapter shall include locks that allow doors to classrooms and any room with an occupancy of five or more persons to be locked from the inside. (b) The locks shall conform to the specifications and requirements set forth in Title 24 of the California Code of Regulations. (c) Doors that are locked from the outside at all times and pupil restrooms are exempt from the requirements of this section. (d)This section shall remain in effect only until July 1, 2012, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before July 1, 2012, deletes or extends that date.   SEC. 2.   Section 17075.50 is added to the Education Code, to read: 17075.50. (a) On and after July 1, 2012, all new construction and modernization projects submitted to the Division of the State Architect pursuant to this chapter shall include locks that allow doors to classrooms and any room with an occupancy of five or more persons to be locked from the inside.   SECTION 1.   Section 17075.52 is added to the Education Code, to read:   17075.52.   (a) On and after July 1, 2012, all modernization projects submitted to the Division of the State Architect pursuant to this chapter that include rehabilitation in a classroom or a room with an occupancy of five or more persons shall include the installation of locks that allow the doors to the classroom or room to be locked from the inside.  (b) The locks shall conform to the specifications and requirements set forth in Title 24 of the California Code of Regulations. (c) Doors that are locked from the outside at all times and pupil restrooms are exempt from the requirements of this section.  SEC. 3.   SEC. 2.  Section 81131 is added to the Education Code, to read: 81131. (a) On and after July 1, 2012, all plans for the construction or alteration of any community college facilities submitted to the Department of General Services pursuant to this article shall include locks that allow doors to classrooms and any room with an occupancy of five or more persons to be locked from the inside. (b) The locks shall conform to the specifications and requirements set forth in Title 24 of the California Code of Regulations. (c) Doors that are locked from the outside at all times and student restrooms are exempt from the requirements of this section.