California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB85 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 05/10/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 85AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 10, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Mendoza (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Hall, and Solorio) JANUARY 6, 2011 An act to add Sections 17075.52 and 81131 to  ,  the Education Code, relating to school facilities. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 85, as amended, Mendoza. School facilities: security locks. Existing law, the Leroy F. Greene School Facilities Act of 1998 (the Greene Act), requires the State Allocation Board to allocate to applicant school districts prescribed per-unhoused-pupil state funding for construction and modernization of school facilities, including hardship funding and supplemental funding for site development and acquisition. Under existing law, all new construction projects submitted to the Division of the State Architect pursuant to the Greene Act are required to include locks that allow doors to classrooms and rooms with an occupancy of 5 or more persons to be locked from the inside, except as specified. Existing law requires the Department of General Services to pass upon, and approve or reject, all plans for the construction of, or, if the estimated cost exceeds $25,000, the alteration of, any building used, or designed to be used, for community college purposes. This bill, on and after July 1, 2012, would require modernization projects for school facilities submitted under the Greene Act to the Division of the State Architect that include rehabilitation in a classroom or a room with an occupancy of 5 or more persons, as well as construction plans for community college facilities submitted to the Department of General Services  and plans for the alteration of community college facilities that include rehabilitation in a classroom or a room with an occupancy of 5 or more persons  , to include  the installation of  locks that allow doors to be locked from the inside, except as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 17075.52 is added to the Education Code, to read: 17075.52. (a) On and after July 1, 2012, all modernization projects submitted to the Division of the State Architect pursuant to this chapter that include rehabilitation in a classroom or a room with an occupancy of five or more persons shall include the installation of locks that allow the doors to the classroom or room to be locked from the inside. (b) The locks shall conform to the specifications and requirements set forth in Title 24 of the California Code of Regulations. (c) Doors that are locked from the outside at all times and pupil restrooms are exempt from the requirements of this section. SEC. 2. Section 81131 is added to the Education Code, to read: 81131. (a) On and after July 1, 2012, all plans for the construction  or   of community college facilities submitted to the Department of General Services pursuant to this article and plans for the  alteration of  any  community college facilities  that include rehabilitation in a classroom or a room with an occupancy of five or more persons  submitted to the Department of General Services pursuant to this article shall include  the installation of  locks that allow doors to  classrooms and any   the classroom or  room with an occupancy of five or more persons to be locked from the inside. (b) The locks shall conform to the specifications and requirements set forth in Title 24 of the California Code of Regulations. (c) Doors that are locked from the outside at all times and student restrooms are exempt from the requirements of this section.