|
02/01/2012
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|