California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB851 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 07/13/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 851AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 13, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 14, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Nestande (Coauthors: Assembly Members Blumenfield, Garrick, and Jeffries) FEBRUARY 17, 2011 An act to add and repeal Section 66942 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 851, as amended, Nestande. Distance learning. Existing law establishes the various segments of the public higher education system in the state. These segments include the University of California, which is administered by the Regents of the University of California, the California State University, which is administered by the Trustees of the California State University, and the California Community Colleges, which is administered by the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges. This bill would require that by January 1, 2014, and every 2 years thereafter, the Trustees of the California State University and the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, and request the Regents of the University of California,  to  report to the Legislature on workload and key performance data on distance learning courses, as defined. This bill would, by February 1, 2012, also require the Legislative Analyst's Office to convene a  task force   work group  composed of  the Legislative Analyst,  specified  members   staff  of the Legislature  ,  and  members of the administration to identify the steps needed   the Department of Finance to evaluate whether it is necessary, or advisable,  to establish the Western Governors University, California. The  task force   work group  would be required to consult with representatives of the University of California, the California State University, the California Community Colleges,  and  the California Postsecondary Education Commission  , independent California colleges and universities, and the Western Association of Schools and Colleges . The  task force   work group  would, by February 1, 2013, be required to report  their   its  findings and recommendations to the Legislature. These provisions would be repealed on January 1, 2018. The bill would state the intent of the Legislature relating to the Western Governors University, California, as a degree-granting institution that is self-supporting and does not receive state funding. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66942 is added to the Education Code, to read: 66942. (a) For purposes of data collection and reporting by the California Community Colleges, the California State University, and the University of California, "distance learning course" means a course conducted with a majority of the instructional content delivered when faculty and students are in different locations and instruction is delivered through the use of technology. (b) (1) By January 1, 2014, and every two years thereafter, the Trustees of the California State University and the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges shall, and the Regents of the University of California are requested to, report to the Legislature on workload and key performance data on distance learning courses, including, but not limited to, all of the following: (A) The number of students enrolled in a distance learning course at each campus, categorized by type of delivery method for the distance learning course. (B) Completion rates for distance learning courses. (C) Program completion rates for degree programs that include exclusively distance learning courses. (2) Student enrollment and completion rate data included in a report to be submitted pursuant to this subdivision shall be made available by demographics such as age, gender, and ethnicity. (c) (1) By February 1, 2012, the Legislative Analyst shall convene a  task force composed of members of the Legislature, members of the administration, and representatives of the Western Association of Schools and Colleges to identify the steps needed   work group composed of the Legislative Analyst, education policy and fiscal staff of the Legislature, and the Department of Finance to evaluate whether it is necessary, or advisable,  to establish the Western Governors University, California. The  task force   work group  shall consult with representatives of the University of California, the California State University, the California Community Colleges,  and  the California Postsecondary Education Commission  , independent California colleges and universities, and the Western Association of   Schools and Colleges  . (2) It is the intent of the Legislature that the  task force   work group  evaluate the establishment of the Western Governors University, California, as a degree-granting institution that is self-supporting and that does not receive state funding. This provision is not intended to preclude the  task force   work group  from evaluating the Western Governors University, California, as a potential qualifying institution for the purposes of California's student financial aid programs. (3) By February 1, 2013, the  task force   work group  convened pursuant to this subdivision shall report to the  relevant policy and fiscal committees of the  Legislature on the findings and recommendations of the  task force   work group  . (d) (1) All reports to be submitted pursuant to this section shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2018.