California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB852 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill June 22, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill March 21, 2011