|
09/06/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2309.).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1242.)
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|