07/03/2012 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | |||
06/23/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/13/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/10/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/12/2011 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/25/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/25/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1047.) | |||
04/13/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |