|
10/07/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2915.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2196.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1745.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Measure version as amended on May 27 corrected.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|