|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1475.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|