02/01/2012 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
01/19/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/18/2011 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/22/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |||
01/07/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. | |||
01/06/2011 | Read first time. To print. |