California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB882 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill June 30, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011