07/11/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/11/2011 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/07/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m. | |||
06/27/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/27/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1574.). | |||
06/22/2011 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
06/15/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/14/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). | |||
05/12/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
05/02/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/02/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1176.) | |||
04/14/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |