LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB89
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB89
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB89
Compare Versions
AB89 Chaptered October 2, 2011
AB89 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB89 Amended September 2, 2011
AB89 Amended August 22, 2011
AB89 Amended June 23, 2011
AB89 Amended May 9, 2011
AB89 Amended April 14, 2011
AB89 Introduced January 6, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB89 Chaptered October 2, 2011
AB89 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB89 Amended September 2, 2011
AB89 Amended August 22, 2011
AB89 Amended June 23, 2011
AB89 Amended May 9, 2011
AB89 Amended April 14, 2011
AB89 Introduced January 6, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare