|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6625.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 4943.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Simitian.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 9. Page 3595.)
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 9).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Measure version as introduced on February 17 corrected.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|