LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB894
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB894
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB894
Compare Versions
AB894 Enrolled September 16, 2011
AB894 Amended September 1, 2011
AB894 Amended August 30, 2011
AB894 Amended July 13, 2011
AB894 Amended April 25, 2011
AB894 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB894 Enrolled September 16, 2011
AB894 Amended September 1, 2011
AB894 Amended August 30, 2011
AB894 Amended July 13, 2011
AB894 Amended April 25, 2011
AB894 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare