|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 225, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1975.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1343.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|