LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB898
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB898
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB898
Compare Versions
AB898 Chaptered September 29, 2011
AB898 Enrolled September 12, 2011
AB898 Amended August 30, 2011
AB898 Amended July 13, 2011
AB898 Amended May 27, 2011
AB898 Amended May 10, 2011
AB898 Amended April 25, 2011
AB898 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB898 Chaptered September 29, 2011
AB898 Enrolled September 12, 2011
AB898 Amended August 30, 2011
AB898 Amended July 13, 2011
AB898 Amended May 27, 2011
AB898 Amended May 10, 2011
AB898 Amended April 25, 2011
AB898 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare