|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 723, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 2961.).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2250.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 1714.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|