06/08/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/31/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 1656.) | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/11/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/10/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/09/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 2). | |||
04/27/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 13). | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and NAT. RES. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |