|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 483, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2932.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 5. Page 2935.).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2250.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 7. Page 1798.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|