09/01/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 208, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/01/2011 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
08/24/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
08/18/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/18/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1959.). | |||
06/30/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/29/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29). | |||
06/15/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/26/2011 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
05/12/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 24. Page 1337.) | |||
04/26/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 25). | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |