|
07/05/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3596.)
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|