|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 465, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6211.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 22).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4483.).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1556.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|