|
10/03/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2163.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1638.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|