06/27/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/15/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/08/2011 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
06/01/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/01/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 31. Page 1695.) | |||
05/09/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 4). | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
04/04/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |